Примеры в одно действие на умножение. Математика 4 класс.




Чтобы увидеть решение, наведите на пример курсор мыши.

60 * 91 = 5460 108 * 63 = 6804 31 * 583 = 18073 590 * 30 = 17700 300 * 47 = 14100
110 * 49 = 5390 92 * 692 = 63664 250 * 5 = 1250 700 * 3 =2100 73 * 80 = 5840
988 * 99 = 97812 930 * 6 = 5580 81 * 415 = 33615 260 * 40 = 10400 690 * 30 = 20700
4800 * 80 = 384000 93 * 40 = 3720 0 * 937 = 0 150 * 80 = 12000 50 * 19 = 950
98 * 50 = 4900 2730 * 7 = 19110 14 * 616 = 8624 890 * 30 = 26700 894 * 70 = 62580
40 * 277 = 11080 2320 * 8 = 18560 8960 * 8 = 71680 82 * 20 = 1640 32 * 50 = 1600
89 * 80 = 7120 87 * 550 = 47850 350 * 30 = 10500 264 * 29 = 7656 4200 * 20 = 84000
350 * 6 = 2100 77 * 60 = 4620 130 * 2 = 260 710 * 2 = 1420 640 * 70 = 44800
780 * 8 = 6240 4300 * 5 = 21500 43 * 371 = 15953 360 * 5 = 1800 46 * 213 = 9798
950 * 2 = 1900 3 * 430 = 1290 9600 * 96 = 921600 44 * 44 = 1936 10 * 12 = 120
630 * 50 = 31500 282 * 73 = 20586 660 * 7 = 4620 330 * 7 = 2310 8500 * 80 = 680000
40 * 729 = 29160 35 * 56 = 1960 65 * 369 = 23985 32 * 40 = 1280 10 * 555 = 5550
22 * 90 = 1980 790 * 50 = 39500 40 * 60 = 2400 480 * 3 = 1440 71 * 30 = 2130
13 * 20 = 260 5100 * 80 = 408000 2800 * 50 = 140000 8300 * 90 = 747000 800 * 8 = 6400
740 * 9 = 6660 15 * 60 = 900 390 * 40 = 15600 570 * 60 = 34200 400 * 80 = 32000
80 * 14 = 1120 480 * 3 = 1440 260 * 60 = 15600 40 * 210 = 8400 46 * 50 = 2300
790 * 40 = 31600 910 * 4 = 3640 2200 * 70 = 154000 1700 * 50 = 85000 40 * 80 = 3200
42 * 80 = 3360 5000 * 30 = 150000 47 * 70 = 3290 8900 * 70 = 623000 580 * 80 = 46400
6300 * 40 = 252000 34 * 90 = 3060 9600 * 90 = 864000 4000 * 30 = 120000 90 * 832 = 74880
380 * 4 = 1520 310 * 8 = 2480 56 * 60 = 3360 337 * 0 = 0 87 * 810 = 70470
853 * 28 = 23884 140 * 3 = 420 590 * 60 = 35400 37 * 587 = 21719 1400 * 60 = 84000
17 * 184 = 3128 300 * 6 = 1800 290 * 2 = 580 929 * 41 = 38089 20 * 90 = 1800
980 * 60 = 58800 100 * 320 = 32000 100 * 64 = 6400 680 * 20 = 13600 42 * 50 = 2100
25 * 60 = 1500 8300 * 60 = 498000 550 * 7 = 3850 749 * 67 = 50183 9 * 20 = 11805
320 * 5 = 1600 140 * 40 = 5600 783 * 50 = 39150 50 * 500 = 25000 859 * 19 = 16321
О * 870 = 0 290 * 2 = 580 700 * 50 = 35000 14 * 576 = 8064 68 * 30 = 2040
428 * 73 = 31244 120 * 6 = 720 640 * 70 = 44800 352 * 40 = 14080 11 * 531 = 5841
300 х 30 = 30030 802 * 7 = 5614 61 * 90 = 5490 750 * 9 = 6750 20 * 90 = 1800
980 * 80 = 78400 97 * 20 = 1940 500 * 8 = 4000 87 * 80 = 6960 60 * 67 = 4020
920 * 70 = 64400 7300 * 40 = 292000 86 * 70 = 6020 770 * 2 = 1540 500 * 70 = 35000
____________________ ____________________ ____________________ ____________________ ____________________